THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:53:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clarence Rockland Family
Health Team
2741 Rue Chamberland
Rockland Ontario K4K 0B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 446-7677
Fax: (613) 446-5737

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J ADAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Adam (CPSO#: 79038 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clarence Rockland Family
Health Team
2741 Rue Chamberland
Rockland Ontario K4K 0B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 446-7677
Fax: (613) 446-5737

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J ADAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Adam (CPSO#: 79038 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEE ADAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEE ADAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003