THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:13:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 515-1385 Bank St
Bank Respiratory Services
Ottawa ON K1H 8N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 523-4444
Fax: (613) 523-6444
Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Montfort Hospital
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 499 Raglan St N
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
Renfrew ON K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-4851
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 07 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Block Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Block (CPSO#: 79041 )
Business Address: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851
Business Address: Bank Respiratory Services
Suite 515
1385 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8N4
(613) 523-4444
Business Address: Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 515-1385 Bank St
Bank Respiratory Services
Ottawa ON K1H 8N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 523-4444
Fax: (613) 523-6444
Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Montfort Hospital
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 499 Raglan St N
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
Renfrew ON K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-4851
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 07 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Block Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Block (CPSO#: 79041 )
Business Address: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851
Business Address: Bank Respiratory Services
Suite 515
1385 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8N4
(613) 523-4444
Business Address: Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER KATHERINE BLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOCK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER KATHERINE BLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOCK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003