THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:15:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-440 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 603 5888
Fax: 416 603 5448
Address: 1366 Yonge St , Suite 410
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
Phone: 416 964 2220
Fax: 416 964 5649

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Azadeh Moaveni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moaveni (CPSO#: 79046 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
West Wing 2nd Floor, 2W428
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-440 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 603 5888
Fax: 416 603 5448
Address: 1366 Yonge St , Suite 410
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
Phone: 416 964 2220
Fax: 416 964 5649

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Azadeh Moaveni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moaveni (CPSO#: 79046 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
West Wing 2nd Floor, 2W428
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AZADEH MOAVENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOAVENI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AZADEH MOAVENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOAVENI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003