THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 07:18:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 417-7899
Fax: (905) 417-8905
Address: 10 Trench Street
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Family Health Navigation Clinic
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Extension: 2388
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Di Santo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Di Santo (CPSO#: 79056 )
Business Address: Suite 201
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple Ontario L6A 4P9
(905) 417-7899

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 417-7899
Fax: (905) 417-8905
Address: 10 Trench Street
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Family Health Navigation Clinic
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Extension: 2388
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Di Santo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Di Santo (CPSO#: 79056 )
Business Address: Suite 201
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple Ontario L6A 4P9
(905) 417-7899

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOREDANA DI SANTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI SANTO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOREDANA DI SANTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI SANTO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003