THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:04:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk
Westside Family Health Cnetr
Suite 409
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-804-9300
Fax: 519-804-9301

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laurie Dusseault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Dusseault (CPSO#: 79057 )
Business Address: 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Business Address: 16 Andrew Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 5R2
(519) 804-9234

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk
Westside Family Health Cnetr
Suite 409
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-804-9300
Fax: 519-804-9301

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laurie Dusseault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Dusseault (CPSO#: 79057 )
Business Address: 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Business Address: 16 Andrew Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 5R2
(519) 804-9234

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURIE ELLEN DUSSEAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUSSEAULT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURIE ELLEN DUSSEAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUSSEAULT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003