THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:07:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit C7
4555 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 507-4300
Fax: (905) 507-4308

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Khalid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Khalid (CPSO#: 79086 )
Business Address: Unit C7
4555 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3M1
(905) 507-4300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit C7
4555 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 507-4300
Fax: (905) 507-4308

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Khalid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Khalid (CPSO#: 79086 )
Business Address: Unit C7
4555 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3M1
(905) 507-4300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASAN FARID KHALID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASAN FARID KHALID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003