THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:41:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Box 58 and 59
Suite 522
790 Bay Sreet
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 591-1222
Fax: (416) 591-1227

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alissia Valentinis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Valentinis (CPSO#: 79090 )
Business Address: 522 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 591-1222

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Box 58 and 59
Suite 522
790 Bay Sreet
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 591-1222
Fax: (416) 591-1227

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alissia Valentinis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Valentinis (CPSO#: 79090 )
Business Address: 522 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 591-1222

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISSIA ROSA VALENTINIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALENTINIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISSIA ROSA VALENTINIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALENTINIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003