THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:41:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Plastic Surgery
Suite M1 519A
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6069
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7 Saint Thomas St
Suite 410
Toronto ON M5S 2B7
Phone: 4169257337
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Snell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Snell (CPSO#: 79096 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite M1 - 519A
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6069

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Plastic Surgery
Suite M1 519A
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6069
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7 Saint Thomas St
Suite 410
Toronto ON M5S 2B7
Phone: 4169257337
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Snell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Snell (CPSO#: 79096 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite M1 - 519A
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6069

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA JEAN SNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA JEAN SNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003