THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:10:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Centre
Intensive Care Unit
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7663
Fax: (905) 804-7744
Address: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sachin Sud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sud (CPSO#: 79097 )
Business Address: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 848-2310
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre ICU
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L4B 1B8
(905) 848-7557

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Centre
Intensive Care Unit
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7663
Fax: (905) 804-7744
Address: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sachin Sud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sud (CPSO#: 79097 )
Business Address: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 848-2310
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre ICU
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L4B 1B8
(905) 848-7557

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SACHIN SUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SACHIN SUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003