THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:46:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 15
300 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 6Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 509-4595
Fax: (905) 509-4597

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Unit 15
300 Kingston Road
Pickering ON L1V 6Z9
Phone: 905-509-4595
Date Received: 20 Jun 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JSM Wylie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wylie (CPSO#: 79103 )
Business Address: 15 - 300 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 6Z9
(905) 509-4595

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 15
300 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 6Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 509-4595
Fax: (905) 509-4597

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Unit 15
300 Kingston Road
Pickering ON L1V 6Z9
Phone: 905-509-4595
Date Received: 20 Jun 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JSM Wylie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wylie (CPSO#: 79103 )
Business Address: 15 - 300 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 6Z9
(905) 509-4595

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN STEWART MAITLAND WYLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYLIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN STEWART MAITLAND WYLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYLIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003