THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 11:20:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3443 Finch Ave. East
Suite 301
Scarborough
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2S1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 491-2193
Fax: (416) 491-6621
Address: SHN, Birchmount campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Internal Medicine/Respirology
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Binh Le Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Le (CPSO#: 79105 )
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
GIM/Respirology Clinic
3030 Birchmount Road
Birchmount Campus
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2600
Business Address: 301 - 3443 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2S1
(416) 491-2193

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3443 Finch Ave. East
Suite 301
Scarborough
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2S1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 491-2193
Fax: (416) 491-6621
Address: SHN, Birchmount campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Internal Medicine/Respirology
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Binh Le Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Le (CPSO#: 79105 )
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
GIM/Respirology Clinic
3030 Birchmount Road
Birchmount Campus
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2600
Business Address: 301 - 3443 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2S1
(416) 491-2193

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN BINH BA HAI LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN BINH BA HAI LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003