THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-39 Campus Trail
Huntsville ON P1H 0E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-789-4377
Fax: 705-789-1640

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melanie Mar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mar (CPSO#: 79106 )
Business Address: Suite 102
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 789-4377
Business Address: 5-39 Campus Trail
Huntsville ON P1H 0E5
705-789-4377
Business Address: 5-39 Campus Trail
Huntsville ON P1H 0E5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-39 Campus Trail
Huntsville ON P1H 0E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-789-4377
Fax: 705-789-1640

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melanie Mar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mar (CPSO#: 79106 )
Business Address: Suite 102
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 789-4377
Business Address: 5-39 Campus Trail
Huntsville ON P1H 0E5
705-789-4377
Business Address: 5-39 Campus Trail
Huntsville ON P1H 0E5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE CHRISTA PEARL MAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE CHRISTA PEARL MAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Dec 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003