THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:11:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Jane Medical Clinic
Unit 101
2780 Jane Street
North York Ontario M3N 2J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 745-8500
Fax: (416) 748-8730

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gronska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gronska (CPSO#: 79114 )
Business Address: Jane Medical Clinic
Unit 101
2780 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M3N 2J2
(416) 745-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Jane Medical Clinic
Unit 101
2780 Jane Street
North York Ontario M3N 2J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 745-8500
Fax: (416) 748-8730

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gronska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gronska (CPSO#: 79114 )
Business Address: Jane Medical Clinic
Unit 101
2780 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M3N 2J2
(416) 745-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET ANNA GRONSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRONSKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET ANNA GRONSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRONSKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003