THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:08:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1W3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164952550
Extension: 1
Fax: 4164952551
Address: 600 University Avenue
Sinai Health
Dept of Emergency Medicine
2B-213
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-5058
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Salamon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Salamon (CPSO#: 79118 )
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2550 Extn: 0
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Address: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency department
2B-213
Toronto ON M5G 1X5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1W3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164952550
Extension: 1
Fax: 4164952551
Address: 600 University Avenue
Sinai Health
Dept of Emergency Medicine
2B-213
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-5058
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Salamon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Salamon (CPSO#: 79118 )
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2550 Extn: 0
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Address: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency department
2B-213
Toronto ON M5G 1X5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA SALAMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALAMON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA SALAMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALAMON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003