THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:26:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Geriatric Psychiatry Program
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Extension: 6772
Fax: (613) 798-2999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Thomas (CPSO#: 79122 )
Business Address: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Geriatric Psychiatry Program
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Geriatric Psychiatry Program
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Extension: 6772
Fax: (613) 798-2999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Thomas (CPSO#: 79122 )
Business Address: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Geriatric Psychiatry Program
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON ROBERT THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON ROBERT THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003