THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:20:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Health Center
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6004
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria Ivankovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ivankovic (CPSO#: 79127 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Emergency Department
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4530
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(905) 813-4530
Business Address: Canadian Place Endoscopy Clinic
1065 Canadian Place
Suite 122-123
Mississauga Ontario L4W 0C2
(905) 813-4530

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Health Center
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6004
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria Ivankovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ivankovic (CPSO#: 79127 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Emergency Department
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4530
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(905) 813-4530
Business Address: Canadian Place Endoscopy Clinic
1065 Canadian Place
Suite 122-123
Mississauga Ontario L4W 0C2
(905) 813-4530

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA NATALIE IVANKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IVANKOVIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA NATALIE IVANKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IVANKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003