THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:50:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 400 Broad St W
Suite 201
Dunnville ON N1A 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 774 7534
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 165 Highway 20 West
Pelham Ontario L0S 1E5
Phone: 9057747534
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HOWATT KING MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Howatt (CPSO#: 98819 ) Dr. A. King (CPSO#: 79129 )
Business Address: 1-165 Hwy 20
Fonthill ON L0S 1E5

Corporation Name: King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. King (CPSO#: 79129 )
Business Address: 206 John Street
Dunnville Ontario N1A 2P7
(905) 774-7431
Business Address: 150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
(416) 350-5900
Business Address: 45 Mill Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 3R6
(416) 869-3376

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 400 Broad St W
Suite 201
Dunnville ON N1A 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 774 7534
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 165 Highway 20 West
Pelham Ontario L0S 1E5
Phone: 9057747534
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HOWATT KING MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Howatt (CPSO#: 98819 ) Dr. A. King (CPSO#: 79129 )
Business Address: 1-165 Hwy 20
Fonthill ON L0S 1E5

Corporation Name: King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. King (CPSO#: 79129 )
Business Address: 206 John Street
Dunnville Ontario N1A 2P7
(905) 774-7431
Business Address: 150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
(416) 350-5900
Business Address: 45 Mill Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 3R6
(416) 869-3376

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON DAVID KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON DAVID KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003