THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:45:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saddam College of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2000 Garth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9B 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-385-1914
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 16 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Lady Minto Hospital
LOCATION: Cochrane

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. TUMA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Tuma (CPSO#: 79139 )
Business Address: 53 Westridge Dr
.
Hamilton ON L9C 0C2
2895050551

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Saddam College of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2000 Garth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9B 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-385-1914
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 16 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Lady Minto Hospital
LOCATION: Cochrane

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. TUMA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Tuma (CPSO#: 79139 )
Business Address: 53 Westridge Dr
.
Hamilton ON L9C 0C2
2895050551

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAIZ LAFTA TUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAIZ LAFTA TUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saddam College of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 04 Aug 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 2003