THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:22:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Saint Marie St
Collingwood ON L9Y 3K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-444-6700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bowman Holloway Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Holloway (CPSO#: 79685 ) Dr. C. Bowman (CPSO#: 79159 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Saint Marie St
Collingwood ON L9Y 3K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-444-6700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bowman Holloway Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Holloway (CPSO#: 79685 ) Dr. C. Bowman (CPSO#: 79159 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE ELIZABETH BOWMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOWMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE ELIZABETH BOWMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOWMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003