THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:47:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103-186 Hurontario St
Collingwood ON L9Y 4T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-532-9803
Fax: 705-444-0270
Address: 459 Hume Street
CGMH
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 240 Eerie street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 0X8
Phone: 705-444-2555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alyssa Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boyd (CPSO#: 79160 )
Business Address: 240 Eerie Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 0X8
(705) 444-2555
Business Address: 459 Hume Street
CMGH
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
(705) 445-2550
Business Address: 186 Hurontario St
Unit 103
Collingwood ON L9Y 4T4
705-532-9803

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103-186 Hurontario St
Collingwood ON L9Y 4T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-532-9803
Fax: 705-444-0270
Address: 459 Hume Street
CGMH
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 240 Eerie street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 0X8
Phone: 705-444-2555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alyssa Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boyd (CPSO#: 79160 )
Business Address: 240 Eerie Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 0X8
(705) 444-2555
Business Address: 459 Hume Street
CMGH
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
(705) 445-2550
Business Address: 186 Hurontario St
Unit 103
Collingwood ON L9Y 4T4
705-532-9803

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALYSSA ROBINSON BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALYSSA ROBINSON BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003