THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:00:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5050 Hillside Dr
Lincoln ON L3J 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 563-8252
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 181 Cambria Rd. N.
Goderich Ontario N7A 2R2
Phone: 226-455-2165
Fax: 888-428-6266
Address: 426 Huron St
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T7
Phone: (226) 455-2165
Fax: 888-428-6266

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Datema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Datema (CPSO#: 79165 )
Business Address: 426 Huron Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T7
(226) 455-2165
Business Address: 5050 Hillside Drive
R.R. 2
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B2
(905) 563-8252
Business Address: 181 Cambria Rd N
Goderich ON N7A 2R2
226-455-2165

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5050 Hillside Dr
Lincoln ON L3J 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 563-8252
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 181 Cambria Rd. N.
Goderich Ontario N7A 2R2
Phone: 226-455-2165
Fax: 888-428-6266
Address: 426 Huron St
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T7
Phone: (226) 455-2165
Fax: 888-428-6266

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Datema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Datema (CPSO#: 79165 )
Business Address: 426 Huron Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T7
(226) 455-2165
Business Address: 5050 Hillside Drive
R.R. 2
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B2
(905) 563-8252
Business Address: 181 Cambria Rd N
Goderich ON N7A 2R2
226-455-2165

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON ALEXANDER DATEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DATEMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON ALEXANDER DATEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DATEMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003