THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:18:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Science Centre
University Hospital
Room A10-213
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-2998
Fax: (519) 663-3449

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Weir (CPSO#: 79181 )
Business Address: London Health Science Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room A10-213
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-2998

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Science Centre
University Hospital
Room A10-213
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-2998
Fax: (519) 663-3449

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Weir (CPSO#: 79181 )
Business Address: London Health Science Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room A10-213
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-2998

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ALEXANDER WEIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ALEXANDER WEIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003