THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:46:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Ave.
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058954521
Extension: 6595
Fax: (905) 952-2818
Address: Southlake/Stronach Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario M5G 2M9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 6595
Fax: (905) 952-2818

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. JC Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wong (CPSO#: 79182 )
Business Address: Southlake/Stronach Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521 Extn: 6595
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiaiton Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Ave.
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058954521
Extension: 6595
Fax: (905) 952-2818
Address: Southlake/Stronach Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario M5G 2M9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 6595
Fax: (905) 952-2818

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. JC Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wong (CPSO#: 79182 )
Business Address: Southlake/Stronach Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521 Extn: 6595
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiaiton Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON CHUN-HANG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON CHUN-HANG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003