THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 09:23:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
2120 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 522-9101
Extension: 6
Fax: (705) 585-4869
Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury, Ontario
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 7055229101
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 05 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saidi Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Saidi (CPSO#: 79298 ) Dr. S. Smith (CPSO#: 79204 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
2120 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 522-9101
Extension: 6
Fax: (705) 585-4869
Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury, Ontario
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 7055229101
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 05 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saidi Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Saidi (CPSO#: 79298 ) Dr. S. Smith (CPSO#: 79204 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHONA ELIZABETH SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHONA ELIZABETH SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003