THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:25:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Practice Address Not Available
2-6265 Perth Street
Richmond
Richmond Ontario K0A 2Z0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 838 2093
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Longfeilds Manor
330 Beatrice Dr
Nepean Ontario K2J 5A5
Phone: (613) 823-8999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1865 Baseline Road
1865 Baseline road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3K6
Phone: 6132255650
Extension: 250
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 114 Starwood Road
Ottawa Ontario K2G 3N5
Phone: 6132244915
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeanette Belanger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Belanger (CPSO#: 79223 )
Business Address: 1865 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON K2C 3K6
Business Address: 114 Starwood Rd
Nepean ON K2G 3N5
Business Address: 330 Beatrice Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2J 5A5
(613) 823-8999
Business Address: 6265 Perth Street
Suite 2
Richmond Ontario K0A 2Z0
(613) 838-2093

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Practice Address Not Available
2-6265 Perth Street
Richmond
Richmond Ontario K0A 2Z0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 838 2093
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Longfeilds Manor
330 Beatrice Dr
Nepean Ontario K2J 5A5
Phone: (613) 823-8999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1865 Baseline Road
1865 Baseline road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3K6
Phone: 6132255650
Extension: 250
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 114 Starwood Road
Ottawa Ontario K2G 3N5
Phone: 6132244915
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeanette Belanger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Belanger (CPSO#: 79223 )
Business Address: 1865 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON K2C 3K6
Business Address: 114 Starwood Rd
Nepean ON K2G 3N5
Business Address: 330 Beatrice Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2J 5A5
(613) 823-8999
Business Address: 6265 Perth Street
Suite 2
Richmond Ontario K0A 2Z0
(613) 838-2093

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEANETTE ELIZABETH BELANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELANGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEANETTE ELIZABETH BELANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELANGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003