THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:42:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Delhi, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Extension: 3961
Fax: (416) 946-4407

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 16 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kumar (CPSO#: 79227 )
Business Address: UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology and Hematology
610 University Avenue, 700U
Suite 6-525
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2308

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Delhi, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Extension: 3961
Fax: (416) 946-4407

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 16 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kumar (CPSO#: 79227 )
Business Address: UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology and Hematology
610 University Avenue, 700U
Suite 6-525
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2308

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJAT KUMAR may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. KUMAR holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. KUMAR may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KUMAR no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. KUMAR no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. KUMAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJAT KUMAR may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. KUMAR holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. KUMAR may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KUMAR no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. KUMAR no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. KUMAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Delhi, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 May 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 May 2003