THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:36:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 180 Keefer Street
#205
Vancouver British Columbia V6A 1X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 688-9428
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 835 King Street West
GRAND RIVER HOSPITAL
RADIOLOGY
1
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Phone: 5197494300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
ST MARY'S HOSPITAL
RADIOLOGY
1
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 5197443311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1371 Broadway W
Vancouver BC V6H 1G9
Phone: (604) 733-4007
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Annabella Yim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yim (CPSO#: 79232 )
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Diagnostic Imaging
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300 Extn: 5912
Business Address: 10 Kingsbridge Garden Cir
GNMI MRI & CT
Mississauga ON L5R 3K6
2899490325
Business Address: 1371 Broadway W
Vancouver BC V6H 1G9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 180 Keefer Street
#205
Vancouver British Columbia V6A 1X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 688-9428
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 835 King Street West
GRAND RIVER HOSPITAL
RADIOLOGY
1
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Phone: 5197494300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
ST MARY'S HOSPITAL
RADIOLOGY
1
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 5197443311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1371 Broadway W
Vancouver BC V6H 1G9
Phone: (604) 733-4007
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Annabella Yim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yim (CPSO#: 79232 )
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Diagnostic Imaging
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300 Extn: 5912
Business Address: 10 Kingsbridge Garden Cir
GNMI MRI & CT
Mississauga ON L5R 3K6
2899490325
Business Address: 1371 Broadway W
Vancouver BC V6H 1G9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNABELLA CHI-KA YIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNABELLA CHI-KA YIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003