THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:10:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 299 Main Street North
Callander Ontario P0H 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 752-1004
Fax: (705) 752-4507
Address: North Bay Regional Health Center
50 College Dr.
P1B 5A4
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Extension: 2159
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derrick Yates Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yates (CPSO#: 79250 )
Business Address: 299 Main Street North
Callander Ontario P0H 1H0
(705) 752-1004
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 299 Main Street North
Callander Ontario P0H 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 752-1004
Fax: (705) 752-4507
Address: North Bay Regional Health Center
50 College Dr.
P1B 5A4
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Extension: 2159
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derrick Yates Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yates (CPSO#: 79250 )
Business Address: 299 Main Street North
Callander Ontario P0H 1H0
(705) 752-1004
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DERRICK ANTHONY YATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YATES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DERRICK ANTHONY YATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YATES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003