THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:23:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 24 Dalhousie St
Toronto ON M5B 2A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-888-878-3563
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lisa Lefebvre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lefebvre (CPSO#: 79263 )
Business Address: 2nd Floor
24 Dalhousie Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 2A5
Business Address: 900 - 150 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M5S 3C1
(416) 340-2866
Business Address: 175 Brentcliffe Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 0C5
Business Address: 102-4 Lansing Sq
North York ON M2J 5A2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 24 Dalhousie St
Toronto ON M5B 2A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-888-878-3563
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lisa Lefebvre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lefebvre (CPSO#: 79263 )
Business Address: 2nd Floor
24 Dalhousie Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 2A5
Business Address: 900 - 150 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M5S 3C1
(416) 340-2866
Business Address: 175 Brentcliffe Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 0C5
Business Address: 102-4 Lansing Sq
North York ON M2J 5A2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA GWYNEIRA LEFEBVRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEFEBVRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA GWYNEIRA LEFEBVRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEFEBVRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003