THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:30:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 82 Essa Rd
Barrie ON L4N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-739-9585
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jul 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dana & Ian Young Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Young (CPSO#: 79288 ) Dr. D. Young (CPSO#: 78423 )
Business Address: 301 Blake Street
Barrie Ontario L4M 1K7
(705) 727-9896

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 82 Essa Rd
Barrie ON L4N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-739-9585
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jul 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dana & Ian Young Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Young (CPSO#: 79288 ) Dr. D. Young (CPSO#: 78423 )
Business Address: 301 Blake Street
Barrie Ontario L4M 1K7
(705) 727-9896

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN GORDON YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN GORDON YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003