THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:02:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168646060
Extension: 5516
Fax: 4168645649

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 08 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kieran McIntyre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. McIntyre (CPSO#: 79289 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Respirology
Room 038-6 Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6026 Extn: 6405

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168646060
Extension: 5516
Fax: 4168645649

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 08 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kieran McIntyre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. McIntyre (CPSO#: 79289 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Respirology
Room 038-6 Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6026 Extn: 6405

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIERAN PATRICK DECLAN MCINTYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTYRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIERAN PATRICK DECLAN MCINTYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTYRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003