THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:47:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6430 Beatty Line N
6420 Beatty Line N
Riverview Medical Group
Unit 203 Fergus On N1M2W3
Fergus ON N1M 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197877418
Fax: 5197877421
Address: 801 St David Street North
Fergus Ontario
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L1
Phone: 519 787 2940
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 450 Queen Street East
Fergus Ontario
Fergus Ontario N1M 2Y7
Phone: 519 843 2400
Fax: 519 843 2200
Address: 235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
Phone: 518 843 2010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 131 Frederick Campbell St
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
Fergus ON N1M 0H3
Phone: 5198432010
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nancy Rose-Janes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rose-Janes (CPSO#: 79297 )
Business Address: 6420 Beatty Line North
Unit 203
Fergus Ontario N1M 2W3
5197877418
Business Address: 235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
(519) 843-2010
Business Address: 801 St. David Street North
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L1
(519) 787-2940
Business Address: 450 Queen Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 2Y7
(519) 843-2400
Business Address: Riverview Medical Group
Upper Level
205 Queen Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1T2
(519) 787-7418

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6430 Beatty Line N
6420 Beatty Line N
Riverview Medical Group
Unit 203 Fergus On N1M2W3
Fergus ON N1M 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197877418
Fax: 5197877421
Address: 801 St David Street North
Fergus Ontario
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L1
Phone: 519 787 2940
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 450 Queen Street East
Fergus Ontario
Fergus Ontario N1M 2Y7
Phone: 519 843 2400
Fax: 519 843 2200
Address: 235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
Phone: 518 843 2010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 131 Frederick Campbell St
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
Fergus ON N1M 0H3
Phone: 5198432010
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nancy Rose-Janes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rose-Janes (CPSO#: 79297 )
Business Address: 6420 Beatty Line North
Unit 203
Fergus Ontario N1M 2W3
5197877418
Business Address: 235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
(519) 843-2010
Business Address: 801 St. David Street North
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L1
(519) 787-2940
Business Address: 450 Queen Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 2Y7
(519) 843-2400
Business Address: Riverview Medical Group
Upper Level
205 Queen Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1T2
(519) 787-7418

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NANCY GAYLE ROSE-JANES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSE-JANES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NANCY GAYLE ROSE-JANES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSE-JANES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003