THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 07:14:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, NORWEGIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 55645
Fax: (519) 685-8176

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Jacob McGee Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McGee (CPSO#: 79302 )
Business Address: 2269271035
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacob McGee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, NORWEGIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 55645
Fax: (519) 685-8176

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Jacob McGee Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McGee (CPSO#: 79302 )
Business Address: 2269271035
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacob McGee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACOB DAVID MCGEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACOB DAVID MCGEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003