THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 07:06:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sports Medicine
Centre of Excellence
17665 Leslie Street, Suite 24
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 319-3090
Fax: 905 836-1991
Address: St. Andrew's College
15800 Yonge St.
Aurora Ontario L4G3H7
Phone: 9057273178
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mackenzie Health Emergency Dept.
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905 883-4103
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
Phone: 9058831212
Extension: 4898
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher J. Fortier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fortier (CPSO#: 79337 )
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
9058831212 Extn: 2310
Business Address: 17665 Leslie Street
Suite 24
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E3
(289) 319-3090
Business Address: Mackenzie Health ER
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 15800 Yonge Street
Aurora Ontario L4G 3H7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sports Medicine
Centre of Excellence
17665 Leslie Street, Suite 24
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 319-3090
Fax: 905 836-1991
Address: St. Andrew's College
15800 Yonge St.
Aurora Ontario L4G3H7
Phone: 9057273178
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mackenzie Health Emergency Dept.
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905 883-4103
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
Phone: 9058831212
Extension: 4898
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher J. Fortier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fortier (CPSO#: 79337 )
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
9058831212 Extn: 2310
Business Address: 17665 Leslie Street
Suite 24
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E3
(289) 319-3090
Business Address: Mackenzie Health ER
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 15800 Yonge Street
Aurora Ontario L4G 3H7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN FORTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN FORTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003