THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 07:40:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Calicut University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 410
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-5663
Fax: (705) 523-1377

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 13 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boji Varghese and Cizy Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Varghese (CPSO#: 78623 ) Dr. C. Mathew (CPSO#: 79348 )
Business Address: 410 - 2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
(705) 523-5663

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM
Medical School: Calicut University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 410
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-5663
Fax: (705) 523-1377

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 13 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boji Varghese and Cizy Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Varghese (CPSO#: 78623 ) Dr. C. Mathew (CPSO#: 79348 )
Business Address: 410 - 2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
(705) 523-5663

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CIZY MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CIZY MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Calicut University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2003
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2003