THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:49:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Campus
Div of Crit Care & Thoracic Surgery
Suite E2 120
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8777
Fax: (519) 685-8778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dalilah Fortin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fortin (CPSO#: 79367 )
Business Address: Victoria Hospital
Room E2-120
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Campus
Div of Crit Care & Thoracic Surgery
Suite E2 120
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8777
Fax: (519) 685-8778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dalilah Fortin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fortin (CPSO#: 79367 )
Business Address: Victoria Hospital
Room E2-120
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALILAH FORTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALILAH FORTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003