THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:54:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Galen Eye Centre
Suite 100
27 Place d'Armes
Kingston Ontario K7K 6Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 507-4800
Fax: (613) 507-4801
Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock St.
Kingston, ON
K7L 5G2
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 533-2559
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Jinapriya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jinapriya (CPSO#: 79376 )
Business Address: Suite 100
27 Place D'Armes
Kingston Ontario K7K 6Z6
(613) 507-4800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Galen Eye Centre
Suite 100
27 Place d'Armes
Kingston Ontario K7K 6Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 507-4800
Fax: (613) 507-4801
Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock St.
Kingston, ON
K7L 5G2
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 533-2559
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Jinapriya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jinapriya (CPSO#: 79376 )
Business Address: Suite 100
27 Place D'Armes
Kingston Ontario K7K 6Z6
(613) 507-4800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DELAN JINAPRIYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JINAPRIYA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DELAN JINAPRIYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JINAPRIYA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003