THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:33:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5973
Fax: (416) 864-6021
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 David Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y2P9
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akshay Bagai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bagai (CPSO#: 79384 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5973
Fax: (416) 864-6021
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 David Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y2P9
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akshay Bagai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bagai (CPSO#: 79384 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKSHAY BAGAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKSHAY BAGAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003