THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:52:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: Bosman, Kylie Anne (Used Until: 22 May 2019) Booth, Kylie Anne (Used Until: 17 Oct 2010)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Collingwood General & Marine Hosp
459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 444 8606
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kylie Booth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Booth (CPSO#: 79392 )
Business Address: Collingwood General & Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
(705) 445-2550

General Information

Former Name: Bosman, Kylie Anne (Used Until: 22 May 2019) Booth, Kylie Anne (Used Until: 17 Oct 2010)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Collingwood General & Marine Hosp
459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 444 8606
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kylie Booth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Booth (CPSO#: 79392 )
Business Address: Collingwood General & Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
(705) 445-2550

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYLIE ANNE BOOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYLIE ANNE BOOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003