THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:58:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South East Toronto FHT
Suite 105, 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6464
Fax: (416) 469-6164

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Blaise Clarkson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Clarkson (CPSO#: 79401 )
Business Address: South East Toronto FHT
840 Coxwell Avenue
Suite 105
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
(416) 469-6464

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South East Toronto FHT
Suite 105, 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6464
Fax: (416) 469-6164

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Blaise Clarkson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Clarkson (CPSO#: 79401 )
Business Address: South East Toronto FHT
840 Coxwell Avenue
Suite 105
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
(416) 469-6464

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BLAISE DAMARIS CLARKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BLAISE DAMARIS CLARKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003