THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:14:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 370-4047
Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Emergency Department
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Extension: 2029
Fax: (519) 376-3888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Gibbons and Caulfeild, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Caulfeild (CPSO#: 76408 ) Dr. M. Gibbons (CPSO#: 79412 )
Business Address: 1800 8th St E
Suite 7205
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
519-372-1807
Business Address: 1415 1st Ave W
Suite 2000
Owen Sound ON N4K 4K8
519-470-3030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 370-4047
Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Emergency Department
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Extension: 2029
Fax: (519) 376-3888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Gibbons and Caulfeild, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Caulfeild (CPSO#: 76408 ) Dr. M. Gibbons (CPSO#: 79412 )
Business Address: 1800 8th St E
Suite 7205
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
519-372-1807
Business Address: 1415 1st Ave W
Suite 2000
Owen Sound ON N4K 4K8
519-470-3030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA KAZIMIERA GIBBONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBBONS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA KAZIMIERA GIBBONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBBONS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003