THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:32:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Gateway Boulevard
Don Mills Ontario M3C 3A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 429-4991
Fax: (416) 422-3573

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Ilk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ilk (CPSO#: 79425 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Address: 10 Gateway Boulevard
Don Mills Ontario M3C 3A1
(416) 429-4991

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Gateway Boulevard
Don Mills Ontario M3C 3A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 429-4991
Fax: (416) 422-3573

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Ilk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ilk (CPSO#: 79425 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Address: 10 Gateway Boulevard
Don Mills Ontario M3C 3A1
(416) 429-4991

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA ANNE ILK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA ANNE ILK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003