THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:54:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bank Respiratory Services
Suite 515
1385 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 523-4444
Fax: (613) 523-6444
Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 08 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tara Keays Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Keays (CPSO#: 79428 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: Bank Respiratory Services
515 - 1385 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8N4
(613) 523-4444

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bank Respiratory Services
Suite 515
1385 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 523-4444
Fax: (613) 523-6444
Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 08 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tara Keays Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Keays (CPSO#: 79428 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: Bank Respiratory Services
515 - 1385 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8N4
(613) 523-4444

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA NOVA KEAYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEAYS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA NOVA KEAYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEAYS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003