THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:14:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
61 Queen St. East
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Address: 235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 461-3000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathon Maguire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Maguire (CPSO#: 79440 )
Business Address: 235 Danforth Avenue
Suite 100
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
(416) 461-3000
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
2nd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
(416) 867-3655

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
61 Queen St. East
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Address: 235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 461-3000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathon Maguire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Maguire (CPSO#: 79440 )
Business Address: 235 Danforth Avenue
Suite 100
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
(416) 461-3000
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
2nd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
(416) 867-3655

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHON LEE MAGUIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGUIRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHON LEE MAGUIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGUIRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003