THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:12:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oshawa Health Centre
Suite 301
247 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 725-1596
Fax: (905) 725-3900
Address: Lakeridge Health Network
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 07 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sharif Missiha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Missiha (CPSO#: 79445 )
Business Address: Oshawa Health Centre
Suite 301
247 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T3
(905) 725-1596

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oshawa Health Centre
Suite 301
247 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 725-1596
Fax: (905) 725-3900
Address: Lakeridge Health Network
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 07 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sharif Missiha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Missiha (CPSO#: 79445 )
Business Address: Oshawa Health Centre
Suite 301
247 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T3
(905) 725-1596

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARIF BISHARA MISSIHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISSIHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARIF BISHARA MISSIHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISSIHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003