THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:00:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 701
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York Ontario M3B 3S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 229-6300
Fax: (416) 229-6283
Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M4K 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Muraca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Muraca (CPSO#: 79448 )
Business Address: Unit 701
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York Ontario M3B 3S6
(416) 229-6300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 701
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York Ontario M3B 3S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 229-6300
Fax: (416) 229-6283
Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M4K 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Muraca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Muraca (CPSO#: 79448 )
Business Address: Unit 701
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York Ontario M3B 3S6
(416) 229-6300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA FRANCA MURACA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURACA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA FRANCA MURACA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURACA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003