THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:34:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1466 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5R 3S3
Phone: 416-531-3331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naymark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Naymark (CPSO#: 79449 )
Business Address: 1466 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5R 3S3
416-531-3331
Business Address: Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 3B2
(416) 516-4111
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1466 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5R 3S3
Phone: 416-531-3331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naymark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Naymark (CPSO#: 79449 )
Business Address: 1466 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5R 3S3
416-531-3331
Business Address: Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 3B2
(416) 516-4111
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON ILANA NAYMARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAYMARK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON ILANA NAYMARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAYMARK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003