THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:22:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
166 Brock Street - B3-002
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 3133
Fax: (613) 544-3559
Address: Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-2131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Saleh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Saleh (CPSO#: 79460 )
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Suite B3-002
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131
Business Address: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666
Business Address: 265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400 Extn: 2028

Corporation Name: Mahassen Ghobrial Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
166 Brock Street - B3-002
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 3133
Fax: (613) 544-3559
Address: Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-2131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Saleh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Saleh (CPSO#: 79460 )
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Suite B3-002
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131
Business Address: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666
Business Address: 265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400 Extn: 2028

Corporation Name: Mahassen Ghobrial Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID SELEMAN SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID SELEMAN SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003