THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:59:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Pediatric Anesthesia
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135933232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Schwartz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Schwartz (CPSO#: 79464 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-2431

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Pediatric Anesthesia
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135933232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Schwartz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Schwartz (CPSO#: 79464 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-2431

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT ANDREI SCHWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARTZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT ANDREI SCHWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARTZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003