THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:20:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Simcoe Muskoka Regional Cancer Prog
Royal Victoria Regional Health Cent
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Extension: 43333
Fax: (705) 739-5619

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. M. Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Stevens (CPSO#: 79473 )
Business Address: 7052419223

Corporation Name: C.M. Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Apr 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Simcoe Muskoka Regional Cancer Prog
Royal Victoria Regional Health Cent
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Extension: 43333
Fax: (705) 739-5619

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. M. Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Stevens (CPSO#: 79473 )
Business Address: 7052419223

Corporation Name: C.M. Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Apr 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAAN SIMEON MICHAEL STEVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAAN SIMEON MICHAEL STEVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003